OR HB3162 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 46, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 46, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 22 of each year as Crater Lake National Park Day. Designates May 22 of each year as Crater Lake National Park Day. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to Crater Lake National Park Day; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 46, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2021. |
2021-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-19 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Anderson, Thatcher. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Breese-Iverson, Reschke. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Hudson, Leif, Nearman, Smith G. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |