OR HB3149 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 674, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 674, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires development of plan for Oregon Coast Trail. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Coast Trail; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 674, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Linthicum. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg, Smith DB. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-07-01 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-07-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-07-01 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |