OR HB3145 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-29 - Vote explanation filed by Taylor.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Public Defense to examine and make recommendations concerning provision of public defense services . Defines terms related to provision of public defense services.] Moves Public Defense Services Commission from judicial to executive branch. Expands membership of commission from seven to 11 members. Modifies appointing authorities and qualifications of members. Modifies manner in which member may be removed.] Directs commission to establish Office of Public Defense Services with trial division in addition to appellate division. Modifies certain policies and procedures commission is required to adopt, including policies concerning contracting and oversight. Requires commission to adopt caseload standards and statewide workload plan. Prohibits commission from approving contract authorizing flat fee compensation structure.] Modifies duties of executive director of Office of Public Defense Services. Directs executive director to develop certain policies and standards for provision of public defense services including performance metrics, quality assurance standards and training requirements. Establishes requirements for contracts for provision of public defense services. Specifies contents of report by executive director to commission and Legislative Assembly.] Establishes Task Force on Municipal Court] Public Defense to examine and make recommendations concerning provision of public defense services in municipal and justice court proceedings]. Directs task force to submit progress report with initial recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary, and to subcommittee of Joint Committee on Ways and Means with authority over budget of Public Defense Services Commission, no later than September 15, 2021] February 1, 2020. Directs task force to submit final report with recommendations and implementation plan to committees no later than December 31, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Public Defense Services Commission; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-29SenateVote explanation filed by Taylor.
2019-06-29SenateSteiner Hayward changed her vote from "aye" to "nay" and serve notice of possible reconsideration.
2019-06-29SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Bill failed. Ayes, 0; Nays, 27--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Beyer, Boles, Burdick, Dembrow, Fagan, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Hansell, Hass, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Thatcher, Thomsen, Wagner; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2019-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2019-06-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-06-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 28--Alonso Leon, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Hernandez, Keny-Guyer, Leif, Lewis, Marsh, McLane, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem.
2019-06-24HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-21HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2019-06-20HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-19HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-19HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-14HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2019-04-22HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2019-04-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2019-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-26HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2019-02-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3145
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3145/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3145/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3145/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3145/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3145/B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28765
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30131
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477300
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477986

Bill Comments

feedback