OR HB3130 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain substitute teachers are considered employees of school district and are eligible for retirement benefits and health benefit plans. Provides that certain substitute teachers are considered employees of school district and are eligible for retirement benefits and health benefit plans. Allows for retroactive applicability of law.
Title
Relating to the employment of substitute teachers.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3130 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3130/Introduced |