OR HB3125 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 827, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from property taxation qualified machinery and equipment used to process grains, bakery products, dairy products and eggs. Exempts from property taxation qualified machinery and equipment used to process grains, bakery products, dairy products and eggs. Excludes from definition of "food processor" persons engaged in business of producing marijuana or any product containing marijuana or marijuana extract and persons without wholesale license issued by State Department of Agriculture engaged in business of producing bakery products. Requires qualified machinery and equipment used to process grains or bakery products to have real market value of at least $100,000 when placed in service to be eligible for exemption. Provides that qualified machinery and equipment used to process bakery products is ineligible for exemption if proceeds from retail sales made at processing site constitute more than 10 percent of all proceeds from sales made at processing site. Authorizes State] department of Agriculture] to fix, assess and collect fees on food processors for certification of qualified machinery and equipment for purposes of exemption statute. Requires department to submit report to Legislative Assembly on impact of amendments to exemption statute. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to property tax exemption for food processing equipment; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 827, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-06SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-01HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 46; Nays, 14--Barnhart, Barton, Buckley, Gorsek, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson.
2015-06-30SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Olsen, Shields.
2015-06-30SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-06-26SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-17SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-06-12SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2015-06-11SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-06-10HouseThird reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed.Ayes, 54; Excused, 2--Barker, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Bentz, Davis, McKeown, Vega Pederson.
2015-06-09HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-08HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2015-06-04HouseWork Session held.
2015-04-01HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-04HouseReferred to Revenue.
2015-02-25HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3125
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3125/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3125/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3125/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3125/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3125/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3125/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22917
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=358175
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23198
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363396
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363910

Bill Comments

feedback