OR HB3124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 371, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 371, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases time that written notice must be posted before removal of homeless individuals from established camping site. Increases time that written notice must be posted before removal of homeless individuals from established camping site. Increases categories of persons to whom unclaimed personal property from camping site may be given. Requires written notice to state how individuals may claim personal property removed from camping site. Requires that unclaimed personal property be stored in orderly fashion. Authorizes donation of unclaimed property to tax exempt charitable corporation. Provides that local law that is more specific or provides greater protections to homeless individuals subject to removal from established camping site preempts contrary provisions of section. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to homelessness; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 371, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 39; Nays, 19--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Gorsek, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill, to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 16--Boshart Davis, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Lewis, Moore-Green, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright; Excused, 5--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Leif, Levy, Nearman. |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading. Smith Warner moved bill be carried over to April 19, 2021 Calendar. Motion carried viva voce vote. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |