OR HB3121 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes legislative findings and declarations regarding genetically engineered food. Requires labeling of genetically engineered raw agricultural commodities and packages of genetically engineered processed food offered or expected to be offered for retail sale within state. Declares commodity or food misbranded if not labeled as required. Authorizes person adversely affected or aggrieved by violation of labeling requirement to bring action on behalf of public interest seeking injunction against continued misbranding. Applies to raw agricultural commodities held or offered for sale on or after January 1, 2018, and processed food packaged on or after January 1, 2018. Refers Act to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to genetically engineered food; providing that this Act shall be referred to the people for their approval or rejection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-03-02HouseReferred to Rural Communities, Land Use, and Water.
2015-02-23HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback