OR HB3110 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires board of directors of publicly traded corporation to have specified proportion of female directors and directors who are members of underrepresented communities. Requires board of directors of publicly traded corporation to have specified proportion of female directors and directors who are members of underrepresented communities. Punishes violation of requirement with civil penalty of at least $100,000] $10,000. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to membership on the boards of directors of publicly traded corporations; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-28 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2021-04-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 18--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Owens, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman. |
2021-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |