OR HB3104 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 97, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 97, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes nonsubstantive and technical changes in Oregon law. Makes nonsubstantive and technical changes in Oregon law. Corrects grammar and punctuation. Deletes obsolete provisions. Conforms language to existing statutes and legislative style.
Title
Relating to correction of erroneous material in Oregon law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 97, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-05-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-19 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 4--Findley, Girod, Heard, Thatcher; Absent, 2--Beyer, Boquist; Excused, 6--Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, Manning Jr, Steiner Hayward, Thomsen. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Lively, Morgan, Smith G, Wallan. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |