OR HB3091 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 273, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 273, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies behavioral health services that must be provided by coordinated care organization. Expands scope of emergency services that must be covered by health benefit plan to include treatment for behavioral health crisis. Requires group health insurance policy to cover specified behavioral health services.
Title
Relating to behavioral health treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 273, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Johnson. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |