OR HB3078 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 673, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 673, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies eligibility for Family Sentencing Alternative Pilot Program. Authorizes court to consider program eligibility as mitigating factor justifying downward departure probation sentence. Increases maximum period of short-term transitional leave for certain Department of Corrections inmates. Reduces, for crimes of theft in the first degree and identity theft, presumptive sentences and eliminates mandatory sentences when defendant has prior property crime convictions. Increases number of prior property crime convictions required for presumptive sentence for theft in the first degree and identity theft to apply. Authorizes supervisory authority to require person convicted of certain property crimes and sentenced to probation to receive high level of supervision. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to establish program to award supplemental grant funds for county downward departure prison diversion programs. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to commission for deposit in Justice Reinvestment Account to fund supplemental grants. Appropriates moneys to Department of Justice for services for victims of domestic and sexual violence. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to monitor downward departure prison diversion programs receiving supplemental grant funds and to study impact of Act on prison population, recidivism rates and public safety. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to public safety; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 673, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Monnes Anderson. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward, Winters. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by McLain. |
2017-07-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed.Ayes, 33; Nays, 26--Barker, Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Clem, Esquivel, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson, Witt; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-28 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-06-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-05-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-27 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |