OR HB3076 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires nonprofit hospitals and their nonprofit affiliated clinics to establish financial assistance policies meeting specified criteria, including reducing charges to low-income patients. Establishes consumer rights with respect to billing and charges for services provided by nonprofit hospitals and their nonprofit affiliated clinics. Requires hospital to post certain information on website, including information regarding its community health needs assessment and three-year strategy to address health care needs of community. Requires Oregon Health Authority to establish community benefit spending floor for hospitals and affiliated clinics. Specifies process for setting community benefit spending floor and factors to be considered. Requires hospital to annually report to authority specified information regarding hospital, its health care facilities and its affiliated clinics. Prohibits insurer from prohibiting hospital from waiving all or part of copayments or deductibles as condition of reimbursement for services under policy or certificate of insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to hospitals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25HouseGovernor signed.
2019-06-19SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-19HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 45; Nays, 15--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Findley, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson.
2019-06-17SenateThird reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Heard.
2019-06-13SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-12SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-06-05SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-03SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-05-21SenateReferred to Rules.
2019-05-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-05-20HouseThird reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Findley, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Keny-Guyer.
2019-05-17HouseSecond reading.
2019-05-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-05-13HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-05-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-16HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2019-04-16HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
2019-04-09HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Health Care.
2019-02-25HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3076
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3076/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3076/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3076/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3076/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3076/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3076/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28984
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29432
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=467724
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29821
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=475388
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=475765

Bill Comments

feedback