OR HB3070 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to inventory resident capacity of residential treatment facilities and secure residential treatment facilities licensed in Oregon and report finding to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health. Requires Oregon Health Authority to inventory resident capacity of residential treatment facilities and secure residential treatment facilities licensed in Oregon and report finding to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health. Sunsets January 2, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to providers of residential treatment; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3070 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3070/Introduced |