OR HB3063 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Removes ability of parent to decline required immunizations against restrictable diseases on behalf of child for reason other than child's indicated medical diagnosis. Allows child who is not immunized or exempt for reason of indicated medical diagnosis to attend school that provides education program through online courses. Prohibits child from attending in-person] in person specified school-related activities] events, meetings and opportunities. Defines "restrictable diseases." Allows Oregon Health Authority to recommend additional diseases against which children may be immunized. Directs boards that regulate certain licensed health care practitioners to review documents completed by licensed health care practitioners granting exemptions from immunization requirements because of indicated medical diagnosis. Defines "licensed health care practitioner." Requires boards to report annually to authority on results of review. Requires authority to report annually to Legislative Assembly on reports submitted by boards. Directs Oregon Health] authority to establish outreach and education plan regarding disease control in schools. Allows child who is not immunized to continue attending school in person until August 1, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health care; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-05-17SenateReferred to Health Care.
2019-05-13SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-05-06HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Alonso Leon, Evans, Keny-Guyer, Leif, McLain, Mitchell, Neron, Sollman.
2019-05-06HouseThird reading. Carried by Helt, Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 25--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, Marsh, McLain, McLane, Nearman, Neron, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sollman, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson, Zika.
2019-05-02HouseSecond reading.
2019-05-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2019-04-26HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-24HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-04-24HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-04-22HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-03-21HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-03-14HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-02-25HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3063
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3063/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3063/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3063/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3063/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3063/B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28200
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29188
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=463900

Bill Comments

feedback