OR HB3035 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 543, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 543, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Corrections Medical Care. Directs Department of Corrections and Oregon Health Authority to establish healthcare navigator pilot program within Coffee Creek Correctional Facility. Directs department, in consultation with authority, to develop health assessment for persons entering facility. Establishes standards for provision of health care to persons in custody. Requires that person in custody be offered copy of medical records upon release.] Establishes healthcare navigator positions for employment within Coffee Creek Correctional Facility. Specifies duties of healthcare navigators. Provides that healthcare navigator salaries are paid by Oregon Health Authority. Appropriates moneys to authority to fund positions.] Establishes Task Force on Corrections Medical Care. Directs task force to conduct review of Department of Corrections medical care grievance process, medical care standards of care and adoption of electronic health records system. Directs task force to submit report and recommendation for prioritized list of medical care to Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Directs Department of Corrections to regularly report to Legislative Assembly concerning health data] medical care and health outcomes of persons in custody and results of survey of pilot program participants]. Sunsets program] task force and reporting requirement on June 30, 2023. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to health care for adults in custody; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 543, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Thomsen, granted unanimous consent to change vote to nay. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Carried over to 06-24 by unanimous consent. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-21 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 20--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Prusak. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-14 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |