OR HB3024 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 440, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 440, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits county from considering property tax classification of dwellings that were previously removed, destroyed, demolished or converted to nonresidential uses when reviewing application for replacement dwelling on lands zoned for exclusive farm use.
Title
Relating to replacement dwellings in lands zoned for exclusive farm use.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Revenue (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Revenue (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 440, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Fahey, Helm, Nathanson; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 3--Hansell, Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Zika. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Fahey, Helm, Mitchell, Nathanson, Rayfield, Sollman; Excused, 2--Barreto, Marsh. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Subsequent referral to Revenue rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Revenue be rescinded. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |