OR HB3022 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Climate, Energy, and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Climate, Energy, and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Environmental Quality Commission and Department of Environmental Quality from adopting or enforcing rules or standards related to motor vehicle fuels or emissions unless authorized by Legislative Assembly by law enacted on or after effective date of Act. Prohibits Environmental Quality Commission and Department of Environmental Quality from adopting or enforcing rules or standards related to motor vehicle fuels or emissions unless authorized by Legislative Assembly by law enacted on or after effective date of Act.
Title
Relating to regulation of motor vehicles by the executive department.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Diehl [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. James Hieb [R] | Rep. Virgle Osborne [R] |
Rep. Werner Reschke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3022 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3022/Introduced |