OR HB3021 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-27 - Chapter 464, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Secretary of State to create and make publicly available list of five most common languages spoken, other than English, by residents of state and of each county. Requires Secretary of State to create and make publicly available list of five most common languages spoken, other than English, by residents of state and of each county. Requires Secretary of State to ensure state voters' pamphlet and county voters' pamphlet are translated into each listed language and to make translated voters' pamphlets available on state and county websites. Requires voters' pamphlets to include, in each listed language, website address for translated voters' pamphlet. Requires Secretary of State to include in translated state voters' pamphlet translation submitted of candidate statement, argument for or against state measure and argument for measure prepared by Legislative Assembly. Establishes Translation Advisory Council. Requires Secretary of State to consult with council to ensure translations of voters' pamphlets are conducted professionally, culturally responsively, accurately and to standard of original version. Applies to voters' pamphlets distributed on or after June 30, 2022. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Secretary of State to carry out Act. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to multilingual election materials; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-27HouseChapter 464, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
2021-07-14HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 10--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2021-06-21SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-17HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Pham. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 16--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Absent, 1--Breese-Iverson; Excused, 3--Morgan, Smith G, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Clem, Marsh, Rayfield.
2021-06-17HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-06-11HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-09HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-09HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-03HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2021-05-14HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2021-05-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2021-05-11HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-26HouseReferred to Rules.
2021-01-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3021
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3021/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3021/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3021/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3021/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3021/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3021/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32370
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32905
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=531704
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=532983

Bill Comments 750

feedback