OR HB3009 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 439, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 439, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that labor organization's charging certain employees reasonable fees and costs for representation that is unrelated to negotiation of collective bargaining agreement is not unfair labor practice. Makes conforming changes. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to labor organization representation; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 439, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2019. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Findley, Hayden, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 3--Hansell, Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 7--Drazan, Hayden, Lewis, Nearman, Reschke, Wallan, Wilson; Excused, 5--Barreto, Keny-Guyer, Noble, Sprenger, Stark. |
2019-04-10 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |