OR HB3006 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to dairy animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to dairy animals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-30 In committee upon adjournment.
2011-05-12 Public Hearing held.
2011-05-05 Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2011-03-28 Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2011-03-28 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2011-03-21 Work Session held.
2011-03-18 Work Session held.
2011-03-04 Public Hearing held.
2011-02-07 Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2011-02-01 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback