OR HB2996 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Center of Cyber-Excellence. Defines purpose of center. Requires center to conduct biennial performance reviews of investments. Requires center to track key performance indicators and to report annually to Department of Consumer and Business Services on status of performance indicators. Creates Center of Cyber-Excellence Fund. Appropriates General Fund moneys to Department of Consumer and Business Services for purposes of center. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Center of Cyber-Excellence; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development. |
2015-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |