OR HB2992 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 121, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 121, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes as condition of enforceability of noncompetition agreement that employer provide signed, written copy of terms of agreement to employee within 30 days after termination of employee's employment. Establishes as condition of enforceability of noncompetition agreement that employer provide signed, written copy of terms of agreement to employee within seven] 30 days after termination of employee's employment.
Title
Relating to noncompetition agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Chapter 121, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 20; Absent, 8--Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Thomsen, Winters. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, McLane. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 15, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |