OR HB2986 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 169, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 169, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to administration of estates.
Title
Relating to estates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 169, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Johnson, Thomsen; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Carried over to 05-17 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 6--Barker, Bynum, Heard, Kennemer, McLain, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-25 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |