OR HB2983 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 637, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 637, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires covered organizations that make political expenditures in excess of specified amount to file with Secretary of State donor identification list that identifies donors that made donations above $10,000 during election cycle to covered organization. Requires covered nonprofit] organizations that make political expenditures in excess of specified amount to file with Secretary of State donor identification list that identifies donors that made donations above specified amount] $10,000 during election cycle to covered nonprofit if covered nonprofit makes aggregate political expenditures above specified amount.] organization. Requires covered organization to update list throughout election cycle. Permits covered nonprofit] organization to establish separate campaign account. Limits disclosure requirement to donations above specified amount deposited into campaign account if conditions followed] exclude from donor list donations from specified charitable organizations and donations and grants received from foundations and other donors that may not be used for political communications. Regulates covered nonprofit] organization acceptance and use of anonymous donations. Establishes civil penalty for failure to comply with covered nonprofit] organization disclosure requirements. Reduces amount of independent expenditure requiring disclosure in ORESTAR from $750 to $250. Expands electioneering communication period from 30 days before primary election and 60 days before general election to 60 days before primary election, 120 days before general election and 90 days before any other election. Establishes procedures for certain election-related investigations. Permits Secretary of State or Attorney General, upon reasonable suspicion of violation, to examine accounts of covered nonprofit being investigated as result of elector filing complaint alleging violation of election law or rule.] Permits Attorney General, during investigation of election complaint, to issue subpoena to compel production of relevant documents or information.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to campaign finance; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Chapter 637, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2019. |
2019-08-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Thomsen. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Gelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Boles, Boquist, Hansell, Heard, Olsen, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Minority report withdrawn. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng Minority) |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng bill. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-06 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2019-06-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 17--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Hayden, Leif, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 3--Findley, Greenlick, Marsh; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith G. |
2019-06-05 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-22 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |