OR HB2980 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 626, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 626, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide funding to peer-run organizations in Portland metropolitan area, southern Oregon region, Oregon coast and eastern and central Oregon region to operate peer respite centers to provide peer respite services to individuals with mental illness or trauma response symptoms who experience acute distress, anxiety or emotional pain that may lead to need for higher level of care. Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide funding to peer-run organizations in Portland metropolitan area, southern Oregon region, Oregon coast and eastern and central Oregon region to operate peer respite centers to provide peer respite services to individuals with mental illness or trauma response symptoms who experience acute distress, anxiety or emotional pain that may lead to need for higher level of care. Provides that at least one peer respite center receiving funding must participate in pilot project designed specifically to provide culturally responsive services to historically underrepresented communities. Requires Oregon Health Authority to adopt criteria for peer respite centers that receive funding and to monitor compliance. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to residential peer support for individuals with mental illness who are in crisis; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 626, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021. |
2021-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 3--Hansell, Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hayden, Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-16 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |