OR HB2970 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that trains and light engines transporting freight must have two crew members. Provides exceptions. Imposes civil penalties for violation. Makes violation Class D violation, punishable by maximum fine of $250.
Title
Relating to railroads.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2970 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2970/Introduced |