OR HB2955 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits employee of contracting agency that conducts cost analysis or determines feasibility of procurement to seek judicial review of cost analysis or determination.
Title
Relating to contracting agencies' decisions concerning procurements for services; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |