OR HB2952 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Human Services for allocation to area agencies to address unmet needs of seniors for mental and behavioral health treatment and to address disproportionate burdens on seniors arising from COVID-19 pandemic. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Human Services for allocation to area agencies to address unmet needs of seniors for mental and behavioral health treatment and to address disproportionate burdens on seniors arising from COVID-19 pandemic. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-15 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |