OR HB2947 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to present options for living independently to adults with developmental disabilities who need placement. Requires department to train case managers on various housing options and provide list of resources for obtaining housing supports.
Title
Relating to independent living options for adults with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2947 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2947/Introduced |