OR HB2945 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires incumbent holder of state office who seeks to be elected to same office to file nominating petition or declaration of candidacy not later than 77 days before date of primary election. Provides that if incumbent candidate for state office files nominating petition or declaration of candidacy and then withdraws petition or declaration, other candidates may file for office not later than 70 days before date of primary or three business days after date of incumbent's withdrawal, whichever is later. Extends deadline for filing voters' pamphlet portrait and statement to match candidacy deadline.
Title
Relating to filing deadlines for candidates for state office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Kennemer, Parrish; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-02-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |