OR HB2940 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 241, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 241, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates exception to 28-day time limit for detention of youth if request for waiver hearing is pending. Creates exception to 28-day time limit for detention of youth if request for waiver hearing is pending. Permits youth to waive 10-day detention review hearings.] Extends frequency of detention review hearings to 30 days if request for waiver hearing is pending. Permits youth to waive appearance at individual 30-day detention review hearing. Requires youth to notify district attorney at least five days before review hearing at which youth intends to request release.
Title
Relating to detention of youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 241, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Kennemer, Thatcher. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 1--Wilde; Excused, 4--Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Levy, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Prusak. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |