OR HB2940 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 666, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 666, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to strangulation; and appropriating money.
Title
Relating to strangulation; and appropriating money.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 666, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-30 | President signed. | |
2011-06-30 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Third reading. Carried by Verger. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Atkinson, Boquist, Starr. | |
2011-06-23 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-23 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-22 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-22 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-22 | Third reading. Carried by Gelser, Brewer. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-08 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-08 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-06 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-03 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. | |
2011-04-08 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. | |
2011-04-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-03-31 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-17 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |