OR HB2939 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 665, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 665, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to safety in public education programs.
Title
Relating to safety in public education programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Barnhart [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Chris Edwards [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] |
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Betty Komp [D] | Rep. Greg Matthews [D] | Rep. Carolyn Tomei [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 665, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-29 | President signed. | |
2011-06-29 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-22 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 51; Nays, 5--Freeman, Garrard, Hicks, McLane, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Buckley, Richardson, Speaker Hanna, Speaker Roblan. | |
2011-06-20 | Third reading. Carried by Nelson. Passed. Ayes, 23; nays, 6--George, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2011-06-17 | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. | |
2011-06-16 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-16 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-10 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-10 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-07 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-06-01 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. | |
2011-05-31 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. (Printed B-Eng) | |
2011-05-24 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-17 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-05-12 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-22 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. | |
2011-04-19 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-18 | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hicks, Richardson. | |
2011-04-14 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-12 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-04-06 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-16 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Education. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |