OR HB2933 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 72, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 6, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 72, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 6, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies, for purposes of Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Board activities, that "workforce development" includes development of residential housing necessary to attract and keep employees in Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Region. Authorizes Oregon Business Development Department to enter into intergovernmental agreements as necessary for administration of Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Board Fund. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to workforce development in the Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Region; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 72, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 6, 2019. |
2019-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Carried over to 04-25 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Housing. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boshart Davis. |
2019-04-08 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Economic Development. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |