OR HB2927 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-16)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 539, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Renames Office of Emergency Management as Oregon Department of Emergency Management. Renames Office of Emergency Management as Oregon Department of Emergency Management. Establishes department as independent state agency. Directs department to carry out certain functions related to regional and statewide emergency response and preparedness. Transfers Oregon Emergency Response System from Department of State Police to Oregon Department of Emergency Management, operative July 1, 2025. Renames office of State Fire Marshal as Department of the State Fire Marshal and establishes department as independent state agency, operative July 1, 2023. Transfers Oregon Homeland Security Council to Office of Governor. Adds members to and modifies duties of commission. Establishes Emergency Preparedness Advisory Council to facilitate policy recommendations related to catastrophic disaster. Sunsets council on January 2, 2030. Establishes Local Government Emergency Management Advisory Council to provide advice and recommendations to Oregon Department of Emergency Management regarding department's emergency preparedness and response functions. Sunsets council on January 2, 2030. Establishes task force to make recommendations as to whether State Fire Marshal should be made independent state agency or housed within existing state agency, operative immediately. Directs task force to report recommendations by February 1, 2022. Becomes operative on July 1, 2022, except as specified. Appropriates moneys from General Fund and increases certain expenditure limitations for various state agencies to carry out provisions of Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to emergency management; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-26 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 539, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
2021-07-19HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-26HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Hayden, Morgan, Smith G, Weber.
2021-06-25SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist.
2021-06-25SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Heard, Manning Jr, Thatcher.
2021-06-25SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng.)
2021-06-25SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-24SenateWork Session held.
2021-06-21SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-21HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Evans, Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Prusak.
2021-06-21HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-06-16HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-10HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-10HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-08HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-13HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-04HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Management with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2927
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2927/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2927/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2927/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2927/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2927/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2927/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2927/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2927/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32053
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32982
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=532276
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534103
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534623

Bill Comments

feedback