OR HB2921 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 421, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 421, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires hospitals to file certain reports showing demographics of hospitals' workforces with Commissioner of the Bureau of Labor and Industries for posting to Bureau of Labor and Industries' website. Requires hospitals to file certain reports showing demographics of hospitals' workforces with Commissioner of the Bureau of Labor and Industries for posting to Bureau of Labor and Industries' website. Prescribes civil penalties] penalty for noncompliance.
Title
Relating to hospital workforces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | House | Chapter 421, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Hansell. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 7--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Knopp, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-04-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nelson. Passed. Ayes, 32; Nays, 21--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Helfrich, Hieb, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Smith G, Stout; Excused, 7--Bynum, Goodwin, Javadi, Nathanson, Pham H, Wallan, Wright. |
2023-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-06 | House | Second reading. |
2023-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |