OR HB2920 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allocates $2,000,000 of lottery revenue to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for Oregon Promise Fund. Allocates $2,000,000 of lottery revenue to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for Oregon Promise Fund. Establishes Oregon Promise Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in Oregon Promise Fund to Higher Education Coordinating Commission to issue Oregon Promise grants. Declares emergency, effective on July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to funding the Oregon Promise program; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2920 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2920/Introduced |