OR HB2919 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Work Session scheduled.
Pending: House Education Committee
Hearing: Mar 11 @ 1:00 pm in Remote E
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires each public university and community college to prominently display total costs of all required course materials and fees for no less than 75 percent of total courses offered by public university or community college. Requires each public university and community college to prominently display total costs of all required course materials and fees for no less than 75 percent of total courses offered by public university or community college. Requires each public university and community college to provide annual report to Higher Education Coordinating Commission detailing compliance with requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to disclosure of costs to enroll in classes at public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseWork Session scheduled.
2021-02-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Education.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback