OR HB2916 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 411, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 17, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 411, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 17, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands transitional housing accommodations allowed inside urban growth boundary to include other structures. Removes limits on operators of and number of campgrounds providing transitional housing accommodations. Removes authority of Department of Consumer and Business Services to apply specialty codes to transitional housing accommodations. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to transitional housing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 411, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 17, 2019. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Post, Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Rayfield, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 4--Johnson, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Winters. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Housing. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh, Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 2--Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Keny-Guyer; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Smith G, Smith Warner, Stark. |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |