OR HB2913 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals abolishment of Oregon Conservation and Recreation Fund. Repeals abolishment of Oregon Conservation and Recreation Fund. Repeals sunset of Oregon Conservation and Recreation Advisory Committee. Appropriates moneys to Emergency Board, out of General Fund, to be allocated to State Department of Fish and Wildlife for purposes of Oregon Conservation and Recreation Fund. Provides that moneys may only be released to department in increments matching deposits into fund from sources other than state government. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Conservation and Recreation Fund; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |