OR HB2913 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 56, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 2, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 56, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 2, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement for person to have surety bond in effect before making, altering, repairing, transporting, storing, providing services for, supplying materials for or performing labor in connection with motor vehicle. Reimposes requirement for surety bond beginning July 1, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to possessory liens on motor vehicles; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 56, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 2, 2019. |
2019-05-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Carried over to 04-23 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hayden, Holvey. |
2019-02-21 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |