OR HB2912 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 745, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Department of Education, Department of Community Colleges and Workforce Development and Bureau of Labor and Industries to develop and implement long-term goals that encourage establishment of joint advisory committees related to career and technical education and that address barriers inhibiting student movement from high schools to post-secondary school programs and workforce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to career and technical education; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-14HouseChapter 745, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
2013-08-14HouseGovernor signed.
2013-07-09SenatePresident signed.
2013-07-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-07-06SenateThird reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 30.
2013-07-03SenateSecond reading.
2013-07-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2013-07-02SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2013-07-02SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2013-07-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Bailey, Hicks, Weidner.
2013-07-01HouseSecond reading.
2013-07-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2013-06-28HouseWork Session held.
2013-06-24HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2013-06-24HouseWork Session held.
2013-06-20HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2013-05-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-04-18HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2013-03-11HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2013-03-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2013-03-08HouseWork Session held.
2013-03-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-02-18HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2013-02-13HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback