OR HB2909 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows delivery of marijuana items, pursuant to bona fide orders, to consumers within city or county in which marijuana retailer is located and to consumers in cities or counties that have adopted ordinances allowing for delivery of marijuana items from adjacent cities or counties. Allows governing body of city or county to adopt ordinance allowing for delivery of marijuana items from adjacent city or county. Allows marijuana retailer to make deliveries of marijuana items to more than one consumer per delivery trip. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to intrastate delivery of marijuana items; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Economic Development. |
2019-02-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2909 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2909/Introduced |