OR HB2898 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Education to develop method for analyzing student progress toward high school graduation that takes account of change in degree of credit deficiency among credit-deficient students and change in dropout rate among credit-deficient students. Requires school district and school performance reports to include information on progress toward graduation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to analysis of progress toward graduation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-04-10HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-03-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Education.
2017-02-13HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback