OR HB2898 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increases amount of reimbursement from Oregon Production Investment Fund that is available to local filmmaker or media production services company. Applies to fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2015. Extends sunset on tax credit for certified film production development contributions to Oregon Production Investment Fund. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to incentives for film production or media production; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-04-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-04-13HouseReferred to Revenue by prior reference.
2015-04-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
2015-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2015-03-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-02-13HouseReferred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2015-02-06HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback