OR HB2897 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to develop program under which department, pursuant to contracts with financial institutions, provides loan guarantees or credit guarantees for qualified veterans for purpose of refinancing existing purchase-money mortgages or similar mortgages of homes used primarily as principal residence by veterans. Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to develop program under which department, pursuant to contracts with credit unions] financial institutions, provides loan guarantees or credit guarantees for qualified veterans for purpose of refinancing existing purchase-money mortgages or similar mortgages of homes used primarily as principal residence by veterans. Prohibits department from paying amounts due under loan or credit guarantee agreement from any source other than available funds in Veterans Refinancing and Reintegration Services Fund. Provides that amounts due and payable under agreement do not constitute debt, or lending of credit, of state. Authorizes financial institution to exercise rights against security if there are insufficient available funds to pay amounts due under loan or credit guarantee agreement. Establishes Veterans Refinancing and Reintegration Services Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to department. Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to include in Governor's budget request to Legislative Assembly for each fiscal period amounts sufficient to permit payment of amounts due on unpaid loan and credit guarantees for that fiscal period.
Title
Relating to refinancing options for veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Deborah Boone [D] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. John Huffman [R] |
Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2015-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |