OR HB2896 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that court may not issue warrant or impose sanction of confinement for contempt that results from defendant's failure to comply with judgment debtor examination or written interrogatories. Provides that person against whom contempt complaint has been issued as result of failure to comply with judgment debtor examination or written interrogatories may not be cited to appear in lieu of custody. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to judgment debtors; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2896 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2896/Introduced |