OR HB2894 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
For purposes of tax credits for energy conservation projects, increases amount of eligible cost for which credit may be claimed using informational filing system in place of certification.
Title
Relating to energy incentive programs; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to Finance and Revenue carried on voice vote. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng. Minority) |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-05-28 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Gelser. |
2013-05-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bailey. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 14--Cameron, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gelser, Hanna, Hicks, Jenson, McLane, Olson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Matthews. |
2013-05-24 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-05-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-02 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-04-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-03-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |