OR HB2893 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Chapter 137, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Chapter 137, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits financial institution to conduct savings promotion raffle, subject to specified conditions. Exempts savings promotion raffles from definition of "gambling." Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to savings promotion raffles; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | House | Chapter 137, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2015. |
2015-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Davis. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2015-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 2, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-03-31 | House | Second reading. |
2015-03-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2015-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |