OR HB2893 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Chapter 244, (2013 Laws): Effective date May 28, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Chapter 244, (2013 Laws): Effective date May 28, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increases allowed cumulative nameplate capacity of qualifying solar photovoltaic energy systems enrolled in certain pilot programs established by Public Utility Commission.
Title
Relating to solar photovoltaic energy systems; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Chapter 244, (2013 Laws): Effective date May 28, 2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed. Ayes, 19; nays, 10--Baertschiger, Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Beyer. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Freeman, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Bailey. |
2013-04-12 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-11 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2013-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2013-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |